US HB2444 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish Fort San Gerónimo del Boquerón in Puerto Rico as an affiliated area of the National Park System, and for other purposes.
Title
Fort San Gerónimo Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 409. |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-568. |
2021-07-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-07-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-14 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-05-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |