US HB2444 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Eastern European Security Act This bill authorizes the President to make direct loans to countries that joined the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) after March 1, 1999, for the purchase of U.S. defense articles. The President may (1) make such loans with lower interest rates than required by statute, and (2) charge fees associated with such loans. Before making such a loan, the Department of State shall certify to Congress that the receiving country is (1) making demonstrable progress toward meeting its NATO defense-spending obligations, and (2) respecting the country's constitution and upholding democratic values.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eastern European Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2020-03-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-03-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1546)
2020-03-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2444.
2020-03-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1546-1547)
2020-03-09HouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-12-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2019-12-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-05-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3194 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback