US HB2441 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-14)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 117-21. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), during FY2022, to establish and maintain three new centers of the Rural Access Network for Growth Enhancement (RANGE) Program in areas with interest from personnel and a need for additional mental health care for rural veterans. The RANGE Program serves veterans in rural areas who are experiencing mental illness. The bill requires the Government Accountability Office to conduct a study and report on whether the VA has sufficient resources to serve rural veterans who need mental health care that is more intensive than traditional outpatient therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sgt. Ketchum Rural Veterans Mental Health Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseBecame Public Law No: 117-21. (TXT | PDF)
2021-06-30HouseSigned by President.
2021-06-30HousePresented to President.
2021-06-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-06-24SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2021-06-24SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4796)
2021-05-19SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-05-18HousePursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 403, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 144, as amended; H.R. 204, as amended; H.R. 210, as amended; H.R. 240; H.R. 707, as amended; H.R. 711, as amended; H.R. 1157, as amended; H.R. 1447, as amended; H.R. 1510, as amended; H.R. 1711, as amended; H.R. 2027; H.R. 2167, as amended; H.R. 2441; H.R. 2494; H.R. 2533; H.R. 2655, as amended; H.R. 2695, H.R. 2704; H.R. 2788; H.R. 2878, as amended; and H.R. 3008. (consideration: CR H2482-2520; text: CR H2513)
2021-05-18HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 403, proceedings on H.R. 2441 are considered vacated.
2021-05-17HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-05-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2441.
2021-05-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2375-2378; text: CR H2375-2376)
2021-05-17HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-05-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6.
2021-05-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-05-04HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
2021-04-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-04-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1468 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback