US HB2440 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Pending: Senate Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Pending: Senate Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a discretionary spending limit adjustment for full utilization of the Harbor Maintenance Trust Fund to ensure that funds are used to support navigation and maintain federally authorized harbors. The bill makes certain amounts in the trust fund available, without appropriation, to pay 100% of the eligible operations and maintenance costs of specified portions of the Saint Lawrence Seaway (a system of locks, canals, and channels in Canada and the United States that permits oceangoing vessels to travel from the Atlantic Ocean to the Great Lakes); and up to 100% of the eligible operations and maintenance costs assigned to commercial navigation of all U.S. harbors and inland harbors. The discretionary spending adjustment in a given fiscal year may not exceed the amount within the Harbor Maintenance Trust Fund on the last day of the fiscal year that is two years prior to such fiscal year.
Title
Full Utilization of the Harbor Maintenance Trust Fund Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 585 (Y: 296 N: 109 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 296 - 109 (Roll no. 585). (text: CR H8479-8480) |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8519-8520) |
2019-10-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2440. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8479-8484) |
2019-10-28 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 100. |
2019-07-02 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2019-07-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-136, Part I. |
2019-05-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2396 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget deficits and national debt
Congressional oversight
Government trust funds
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Sales and excise taxes
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Water resources funding
Budget deficits and national debt
Congressional oversight
Government trust funds
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Sales and excise taxes
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
User charges and fees
Water resources funding