US HB2428 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide the Inspector General of the Department of Veterans Affairs testimonial subpoena authority, and for other purposes.
Title
Strengthening Oversight for Veterans Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-06 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-06 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2021-04-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2687 (Same As) 2022-06-07 - Became Public Law No: 117-136.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2428/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2428/BILLS-117hr2428ih.pdf |