US HB2426 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 109-44)
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 266.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CASE Act of 2019 Copyright Alternative in Small-Claims Enforcement Act of 2019 This bill creates the Copyright Claims Board, a body within the U.S. Copyright Office, to decide copyright disputes. Damages awarded by the board are capped at $30,000. Participation in board proceedings is voluntary with an opt-out procedure for defendants, and parties may choose instead to have a dispute heard in court. If the parties agree to have their dispute heard by the board, they shall forego the right to be heard before a court and the right to a jury trial. Board proceedings shall have no effect on class actions. The board shall be authorized to hear copyright infringement claims, actions for a declaration of noninfringement, claims that a party knowingly sent false takedown notices, and related counterclaims. The bill provides for various procedures, including with respect to requests for information from the other party and requests for the board to reconsider a decision. The board may issue monetary awards based on actual or statutory damages. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs except where there is bad faith misconduct. A board's final determination precludes relitigating the claims in court or at the board. Parties may challenge a board decision in federal district court only if (1) the decision was a result of fraud, corruption, or other misconduct; (2) the board exceeded its authority or failed to render a final determination; or (3) in a default ruling or failure to prosecute, the default or failure was excusable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CASE Act of 2019 Copyright Alternative in Small-Claims Enforcement Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]

Roll Calls

2019-10-22 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 578 (Y: 410 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 266.
2019-10-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-10-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 6 (Roll no. 578). (text: CR H8345-8352)
2019-10-22HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8370-8371)
2019-10-22HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-10-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2426.
2019-10-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8345-8353)
2019-10-22HouseMr. Jeffries moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-10-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 201.
2019-10-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-252.
2019-09-10HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-09-10HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-10HouseSubcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-05-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1273 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 206.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback