US HB2424 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 93.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Agricultural Marketing Service of the Department of Agriculture to establish a program to award grants to states or state departments of agriculture to provide support to agricultural fairs for losses sustained by such fairs due to COVID-19. Grant amounts shall be based on the difference between the average attendance at agricultural fairs in the state for (1) a calendar year occurring during the three-year period beginning with 2017 or, if the attendance data is not available for the entire period, a period shorter than a calendar year; and (2) the average attendance at agricultural fairs in the state for calendar year 2020. As a condition of receiving a grant, recipients shall agree to (1) prioritize supporting agricultural fairs in the state facing the greatest financial hardship, and (2) use not more than 5% of grant funds for administrative costs incurred in providing support to agricultural fairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural Fairs Rescue Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-27HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 93.
2021-09-27HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 117-129.
2021-09-21HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-09-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-04-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2021-04-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1092 (Related) 2021-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback