US HB2416 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize a military and civilian partnership for trauma readiness grant program.
Title
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize a military and civilian partnership for trauma readiness grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-03-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2333 (Related) 2023-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 202.
HB4421 (Related) 2023-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23.
HB4697 (Related) 2023-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4421 (Related) 2023-07-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 23.
HB4697 (Related) 2023-07-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2416/BILLS-118hr2416ih.pdf |