US HB2416 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires contracting officers of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to use purchases of goods or services through the federal supply schedules for the purpose of meeting the government-wide goal for participation by small businesses owned and controlled by veterans and service-disabled veterans.
Title
To require the Department of Veterans Affairs to use purchases of goods or services through the Federal supply schedules for the purpose of meeting certain contracting goals for participation by small business concerns owned and controlled by veterans, including veterans with service-connected disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Adler [D-NJ] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. John Hall [D-NY] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Ciro Rodriguez [D-TX] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-08 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-10-08 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-09-24 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-05-15 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2415 (Related) 2009-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2416/BILLS-111hr2416ih.pdf |