US HB2415 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 97-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dignity for Detained Immigrants Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dignity for Detained Immigrants Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-05-09HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3666)
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1243 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback