US HB2398 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Veteran HOUSE Act of 2020 Veteran Housing Opportunities and Unemployment Support Extension Act of 2020 This bill expands eligibility for the Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) Veterans Affairs-Supported Housing (VASH) rental voucher assistance to homeless veterans honorably discharged or released from active military, naval, or air service regardless of length of service. According to federal regulations, HUD was granted authority in the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2008 to waive or provide an alternative for the current requirement that HUD-VASH assistance be targeted to homeless veterans who have chronic mental illnesses or chronic substance-use disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran HOUSE Act of 2020 Veteran Housing Opportunities and Unemployment Support Extension Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 15 (Y: 362 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2020-01-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-01-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 362 - 31 (Roll no. 15). (text: CR H194)
2020-01-13HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H202-203)
2020-01-13HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-01-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2398.
2020-01-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H194-195)
2020-01-13HouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-11-14HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 0.
2019-11-14HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2061 (Related) 2019-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback