US HB2385 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 259.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CFPB Pay Fairness Act of 2013 - Amends the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, with respect to compensation of employees of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB), to require the CFPB Director to set and adjust the rates of basic pay for CFPB employees in accordance with the General Schedule for federal employees. (Currently, the Director is merely authorized to do so.) Repeals the requirement that the Director at all times provide compensation (including benefits) to each class of employees at least comparable to the compensation and benefits then being provided by the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System for the corresponding class of Federal Reserve employees. Repeals also the requirement that all such employees be compensated (including benefits) on terms and conditions consistent with specified terms and conditions of the Federal Reserve Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CFPB Pay Fairness Act of 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 259.
2014-02-10HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
2014-02-10HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 113-349, Part I.
2013-11-21HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 23.
2013-11-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2013-10-29HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
2013-06-14HouseReferred to House Oversight and Government Reform
2013-06-14HouseReferred to House Financial Services
2013-06-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Same As/Similar To

HB3194 (Related) 2013-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback