US HB2383 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 91-15)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates grants for state and local governments to combat hate crimes. It also authorizes additional penalties for hate crime offenses. Specifically, it establishes grants for states to create state-run hate crimes reporting hotlines. It also authorizes grants for states and local governments to implement the National Incident-Based Reporting System and to conduct law enforcement activities or crime reduction programs to prevent, address, or respond to hate crimes. Finally, in the case of an individual convicted of a hate crime offense and placed on supervised release, the bill allows a court to order that the individual participate in educational classes or community service as a condition of supervised release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jabara-Heyer NO HATE Act of 2021 Khalid Jabara and Heather Heyer National Opposition to Hate, Assault, and Threats to Equality Act of 2021

Sponsors

Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Peter Meijer [R-MI]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-04-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-04-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB937 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 117-13. (TXT | PDF)
SB1086 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback