US HB2375 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit prescription drug companies from compensating other prescription drug companies to delay the entry of a generic drug, biosimilar biological product, or interchangeable biological product into the market.
Title
Preserve Access to Affordable Generics and Biosimilars Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 576. |
2020-12-24 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-12-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-693, Part I. |
2019-04-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB64 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1344 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB1344 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Contracts and agency
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Intellectual property
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Contracts and agency
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Intellectual property
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Prescription drugs