US HB2374 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-14)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of State to submit annual reports reviewing the educational material used by the Palestinian Authority, and for other purposes.
Title
Peace and Tolerance in Palestinian Education Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East, North Africa and Global Counterterrorism. |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3209 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2374/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2374/BILLS-117hr2374ih.pdf |