US HB2370 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Escambia County Land Conveyance Act (Sec. 3) This bill authorizes Escambia County, Florida, to convey its interest in any part of the former Santa Rosa Island National Monument land that was conveyed to it by the federal government in 1947 to any person or entity, without restriction. The bill prohibits any person or entity holding a leasehold interest in such land from being required to involuntarily accept a fee interest to such land in place of the leasehold interest. The bill states that all interest of Escambia County in any part of such land that is within the jurisdictional boundaries of Santa Rosa County, Florida, shall be conveyed by Escambia County to such county within two years of the enactment of this bill. Santa Rosa County or any other person to whom such county reconveys such land may reconvey any part of it. Any proceeds from the conveyance of such land by either county (other than the amounts that are paid for the direct and incidental costs associated with the conveyance) shall be considered to be windfall profits that shall revert to the United States. Escambia County must preserve in perpetuity those areas of the monument land conveyed under this bill that, as of this bill's enactment, are dedicated for conservation, preservation, public recreation access, and public parking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Escambia County Land Conveyance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-27SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-07-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6329)
2017-07-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2370.
2017-07-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6328-6330)
2017-07-26HouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-07-20HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 168.
2017-07-20HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-236.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-06-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-05-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1073 (Same As) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback