US HB2369 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Supply and Distribution Act of 2015 This bill declares that the production and distribution of energy in the United States requires access to infrastructure and markets. The Department of Energy (DOE) must collaborate with federal agencies to improve the conceptual development of energy security, considering at a minimum: (1) development of flexible, transparent, and competitive energy markets, including natural gas and oil; and (2) diversification of energy fuels, sources, and routes, and the encouragement of indigenous sources of energy supply. DOE must also coordinate interagency: (1) data collection for energy distribution on shared energy infrastructure, and (2) training to evaluate and implement cross-border energy projects. It is the sense of Congress that growth in crude oil and dry natural gas production varies significantly across oil and natural gas supply regions, thereby: (1) forcing shifts in crude oil and natural gas flows between regions of the United States, and (2) requiring investment or realignment of midstream infrastructure including pipelines. The Energy Information Administration must collaborate with officials in Canada and Mexico to reconcile data on energy trade flows, extend energy mapping capabilities, and develop common energy data terminology. Congress declares that processed condensate is a petroleum product. The DOE Office of Fossil Energy Assessment may assess the suitability of condensate separately from crude oil for use in strategic reserves, while certain agencies within the Department of the Interior must assess condensate separately from crude oil. The bill authorizes: (1) the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management to estimate condensate separately from crude oil as part of the resource assessments regarding domestic geological formations, (2) the Office of Natural Resources Revenue to collect condensate data separately from crude oil, and (3) the United States Geological Survey to include estimates of condensate separately from crude oil as part of the resource assessments regarding domestic geological formations. Domestic crude oil or condensate (except crude oil stored in the Strategic Petroleum Reserve) may be exported without a federal license to countries not subject to U.S. sanctions.
Title
Energy Supply and Distribution Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1220 (Related) 2015-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1224 (Related) 2015-05-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1312 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1224 (Related) 2015-05-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB1312 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Canada
Earth sciences
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Licensing and registrations
Mexico
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Strategic materials and reserves
Trade restrictions
Earth sciences
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government information and archives
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Licensing and registrations
Mexico
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Strategic materials and reserves
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2369/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2369/BILLS-114hr2369ih.pdf |