US HB2368 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 103.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting and Treating Officers In Crisis Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 103.
2019-07-09HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-140.
2019-06-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-05-17HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3955)
2019-04-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB998 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - Presented to President.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback