US HB2365 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Desert Community Lands Act This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey, without consideration, to the town of Apple Valley in California the surface estate of specified land, to be known and designated as the Apple Valley Off-Highway Vehicle Recreation Area. The conveyed land may be used by the town to provide: (1) a suitable location for the establishment of a centralized, off-road vehicle recreation park; (2) the public with opportunities for off-road vehicle recreation; and (3) a designated area and facilities that would discourage unauthorized use of off-highway vehicles in areas that have been identified by the federal government, the state of California, or San Bernardino County, California, to contain environmentally sensitive land. Such land may not be disposed of by the town without Interior's approval. Interior may develop a special management plan for the recreation area to enhance the safe use of off-highway vehicles for recreational purposes. Interior shall convey, without consideration, the surface estate of specified lands to the cities of Twentynine Palms, Barstow, and Victorville in California. All land conveyances under this bill are subject to valid existing rights and do not include the mineral estate in the lands conveyed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Desert Community Lands Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 15.
2018-06-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-06-13HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2018-05-17HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-05-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-05-04HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback