US HB2364 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to provide education and training related to synthetic opioids, including fentanyl and its analogues. Specifically, HHS must launch a public education campaign on the dangers of synthetic opioids and related issues. HHS must also produce training materials to prevent exposure to synthetic opioids for first responders and others who are at high risk of such exposure and disseminate the materials to ambulance transport personnel, local sheriff deputies, and other first responders and individuals in high-risk occupations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Synthetic Opioid Danger Awareness Act Synthetic Opioid Danger Awareness Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 411 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2021-12-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-12-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 14 (Roll no. 423).
2021-12-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7541-7542)
2021-11-30HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-11-30HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2364.
2021-11-30HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6693-6694; text: CR H6693)
2021-11-30HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-11-30HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 131.
2021-11-30HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-181.
2021-07-21HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-07-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-15HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2021-07-15HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-04-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-04-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-04-05HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback