US HB2359 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Whole Veteran Act This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to report on the implementation of its whole health approach to health care. The report must include an analysis of the accessibility and availability of a variety of services, including hypnosis and acupuncture. The whole health model is a holistic approach that looks at the many areas of life that may affect health in order to make a health plan suited for each individual based on his or her health goals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Whole Veteran Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4032)
2019-05-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2359.
2019-05-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4032-4034)
2019-05-21HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-17HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 47.
2019-05-17HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-71.
2019-05-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-04-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback