US HB2348 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To maximize land management efficiencies, promote land conservation, generate education funding, and for other purposes.
Title
Advancing Conservation and Education Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-673. |
2021-05-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |