US HB2347 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-3)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies vaccination programs and coverage for children under Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP). Specifically, the bill expands and otherwise modifies the Vaccines for Children Program, which provides free vaccinations to individuals 18 years of age or younger who are uninsured or underinsured (i.e., with limited or no insurance for vaccines), are eligible for Medicaid, or are American Indians or Alaskan Natives. The bill expands the program to include children enrolled in CHIP and temporarily provides for additional payments to incentivize provider participation. The Government Accountability Office must report on the related effects of the bill's changes. The bill also expands coverage under Medicaid and CHIP to include vaccine counseling and educational services for children and temporarily requires payments to be made at a rate that is no less than the rate under Medicare for equivalent services. It also temporarily increases the Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (i.e., federal matching rate) for states that conduct culturally appropriate outreach regarding the benefits of vaccinations for children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthening the Vaccines for Children Program Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-07-21HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-15HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2021-07-15HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-04-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2021-04-01HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback