US HB2340 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to remove regulatory barriers to the re-exportation of controlled substances among members of the European Economic Area. Amends the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to allow exported controlled substances to be re-exported within the European Economic Area. Prohibits the Attorney General from promulgating or enforcing any regulation, subregulatory guidance, or enforcement policy that impedes such re-exportation among European Economic Area countries.
Title
To amend the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to remove regulatory barriers to the re-exportation of controlled substances among members of the European Economic Area.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6 (Related) 2015-07-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Europe
European Union
Trade restrictions
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Europe
European Union
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2340/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2340/BILLS-114hr2340ih.pdf |