US HB234 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Entitles certain veterans who served in the armed forces of the Republic of Korea to hospital and domiciliary care and medical services through the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). Specifically, the bill entitles those veterans who served in the armed forces of the Republic of Korea in Vietnam between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975, or during a time period determined by the VA, and became U.S. citizens after such service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Korean American VALOR Act Korean American Vietnam Allies Long Overdue for Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2021-05-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-05-04HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
2021-02-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-01-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-01-06HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback