US HB2336 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes two Health, Opportunity, and Personal Empowerment (HOPE) pilot projects to improve economic security for individuals who meet income or other requirements. The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), the Department of Agriculture, and the Department of Housing and Urban Development must collaborate on the projects. The first project provides awards to certain government entities to assist eligible individuals in establishing HOPE accounts through banks, credit unions, or governmental agencies. HOPE accounts must (1) provide access to specified financial services and information on public benefits, health insurance, and other topics; and (2) facilitate activities such as applying for government benefits and filing taxes. HHS must hold a competition to award contracts to private businesses and nonprofits to develop technology applications and other tools for HOPE accounts. The second pilot project provides grants that allow government and nonprofit organizations to enter voluntary agreements with eligible individuals to carry out long-term plans related to improving economic security and upward mobility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOPE Act of 2021 Health, Opportunity, and Personal Empowerment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-04-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Agriculture, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1181 (Related) 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Aging
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Business investment and capital
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Financial literacy
Food assistance and relief
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Libraries and archives
National and community service
Nutrition and diet
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Social welfare
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Telephone and wireless communication
Urban and suburban affairs and development

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback