US HB2331 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-114. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-114. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Connected Government Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires: (1) a federal agency that creates or redesigns a website intended for use by the public to ensure that the website is mobile friendly, and (2) the Office of Management and Budget to report on agency compliance. "Mobile friendly" means that the website is configured in such a way that it may be navigated, viewed, and accessed on a smartphone, tablet computer, or similar mobile device.
Title
Connected Government Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 634 (Y: 423 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-114. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8279) |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-11-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 634). |
2017-11-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9280) |
2017-11-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2331. |
2017-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9142-9143; text: CR H9142) |
2017-11-13 | House | Mr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300. |
2017-11-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-406. |
2017-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1769 (Related) 2017-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 285.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Telephone and wireless communication
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Telephone and wireless communication