US HB2327 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: House Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: House Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hmong Veterans' Service Recognition Act Authorizes burial in any open national cemetery under the control of the National Cemetery Administration of the remains of any individual: (1) who was naturalized pursuant to the Hmong Veterans' Naturalization Act of 2000 and who resided in the United States at the time of death; or (2) who the Secretary of Veterans Affairs determines served with a special guerrilla unit or irregular forces operating from a base in Laos in support of the U.S. Armed Forces between February 28, 1961, and May 7, 1975, and who, at the time of death, resided in the United States and was a U.S. citizen or an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence.
Title
Hmong Veterans' Service Recognition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-05-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2885) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1358 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2936-2937)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Laos
Military personnel and dependents
Vietnam
Asia
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Laos
Military personnel and dependents
Vietnam
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2327/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2327/BILLS-114hr2327ih.pdf |