US HB2326 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to make improvements to the Transition Assistance Program (TAP) that serves members of the Armed Forces who separate, retire, or are discharged from service. Among other requirements, the bill extends by five years the pilot program for providing off-base transition training for veterans and their spouses. Labor must select no fewer than 50 locations to implement the training, and at least 20 shall be states with a high rate of veteran unemployment. The bill requires the VA to make grants to eligible organizations for the provision of transition assistance. Additionally, the bill requires the VA to enter an agreement with an independent entity with experience in adult education to report on the efficacy of TAP. The VA must also conduct a five-year longitudinal study of TAP on three separate cohorts who have separated from the Armed Forces. Finally, the bill grants access to the VA and Labor to certain information reported by employers to states' new hire directories in order to track employment of veterans.
Title
Navy SEAL Chief Petty Officer William "Bill" Mulder (Ret.) Transition Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4035-4036) |
2019-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2326. |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4035-4039) |
2019-05-21 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 49. |
2019-05-20 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2019-05-20 | House | Committee on Armed Services discharged. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-73, Part I. |
2019-05-01 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB1599 (Related) 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB1599 (Related) 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Adult education and literacy
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Personnel records
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation