US HB2325 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Calle Alondra in San Juan, Puerto Rico, as the "65th Infantry Regiment Post Office Building". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Calle Alondra in San Juan, Puerto Rico, as the "65th Infantry Regiment Post Office Building."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 100 Calle Alondra in San Juan, Puerto Rico, as the "65th Infantry Regiment Post Office Building".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-07-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5957)
2019-07-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2325.
2019-07-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5957-5958)
2019-07-17HouseMr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-06-12HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-04-15HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback