US HB2317 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination based on an individual's COVID-19 vaccination status. Specifically, the bill bars certain commercial businesses from discriminating on the basis of an individual's COVID-19 vaccination status. In addition, the bill generally prohibits using federal funds to establish or enforce COVID-19 vaccination requirements. Further, federal funds may not be used to compel an individual with a religious objection to vaccinations to receive a vaccine. The bill also prohibits federal funding of educational institutions that require an individual to receive a COVID-19 vaccine to participate in academic or extracurricular activities. Additionally, a public school or public college may not deny access to the school or college based on whether an individual has received a vaccine, including the COVID-19 vaccine. Furthermore, air carriers may not deny an individual access to air transportation solely on the basis of COVID-19 vaccination status. The bill also prohibits proof of a COVID-19 vaccine as a condition of receiving a U.S. passport. The bill establishes a private right of action for individuals who have been discriminated against based on COVID-19 vaccine status or failure to comply with a requirement to wear a face covering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

We Will Not Comply Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2021-09-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2021-04-02HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-04-01HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback