US HB231 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Canyon Village Land Conveyance Act This bill amends the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act to require the Department of the Interior to convey to Kian Tr'ee Corporation, an Alaska Native village corporation, for the Native village of Canyon Village, the surface estate of up to 6,400 acres of public land selected by the corporation. Interior must convey an equal acreage of subsurface estate to Doyon Limited, an Alaska Native regional corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Canyon Village Land Conveyance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
2017-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1481 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback