US HB2308 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To revise the advanced technology vehicles manufacturing incentive program, and for other purposes.
Title
ATVM Future Act Advanced Technology Vehicles Manufacturing Future Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1512 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2308/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2308/BILLS-117hr2308ih.pdf |