US HB2298 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ROBOCOP Act Repeated Objectionable Bothering Of Consumers On Phones Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROBOCOP Act Repeated Objectionable Bothering Of Consumers On Phones Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
2019-04-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1212 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback