US HB2293 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes specified wheelchairs and associated accessories from Medicare's competitive acquisition program (in which rates are set through a competitive bidding program rather than by an established fee schedule).
Title
Protecting Access to Wheelchairs Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3416 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3429 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-620, Part I.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB3429 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-620, Part I.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2293/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2293/BILLS-116hr2293ih.pdf |