US HB2275 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015 Establishes in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) a Veterans Economic Opportunity and Transition Administration (VEOTA), headed by the Under Secretary for Veterans Economic Opportunity and Transition, to administer VA programs of economic opportunity assistance to veterans and their dependents and survivors. Requires VEOTA to administer the following VA programs: (1) vocational rehabilitation and employment programs; (2) educational assistance programs; (3) veterans' housing loan and related programs; (4) veterans' small business programs, including the program to increase participation in VA contracts by small business concerns owned and controlled by veterans who have service-connected disabilities and by veterans who do not have such disabilities; (5) homeless veterans reintegration programs; (6) job counseling, training, and placement services; and (7) employment and employment rights of members of the uniformed services. Limits the aggregate number of full-time equivalent employees authorized for VEOTA for FY2017-FY2018. Transfers, as of October 1, 2016, to VA specified veterans-related programs of the Department of Labor, including: (1) job counseling, training, employment, and placement services; (2) administration of employment and reemployment rights of members of the uniformed services; and (3) homeless veterans reintegration programs. Directs the President, for FY2017 and thereafter, to include in the budget request funding for the VA for such functions. Establishes a Deputy Under Secretary for Veterans' Employment, Training and Transition.
Title
Jobs for Veterans Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Military personnel and dependents
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Military personnel and dependents
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2275/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2275/BILLS-114hr2275ih.pdf |