US HB2270 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-101. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-101. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act (Sec. 2) This bill redesignates the Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge in Washington state as the Billy Frank Jr. Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge. (Sec. 3) The bill establishes, as a unit of the National Park System, the Medicine Creek Treaty National Memorial within the Billy Frank Jr. Nisqually National Wildlife Refuge to commemorate the location of the signing of the Medicine Creek Treaty of 1854 between the U.S. government and leaders of the Muckleshoot, Nisqually, Puyallup, and Squaxin Island Indian Tribes. The Department of the Interior must: (1) establish the boundaries of the Medicine Creek Treaty National Memorial and to provide for its administration and interpretation by the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service; and (2) coordinate with representatives of the Muckleshoot, Nisqually, Puyallup, and Squaxin Island Indian Tribes in providing for that interpretation.
Title
Billy Frank Jr. Tell Your Story Act
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 413 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-101. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8640) |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2015-11-30 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 2 (Roll no. 645). (text: CR H8430) |
2015-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8433) |
2015-11-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2270. |
2015-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8429-8431) |
2015-11-30 | House | Mr. LaMalfa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 256. |
2015-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-335. |
2015-10-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-10-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-08 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2015-10-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-05-14 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2967) |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2326 (Related) 2015-11-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8165)
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Historic sites and heritage areas
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats