US HB2268 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the list of diseases that are provided a presumption of service-connection for veterans who served in the Republic of Vietnam between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975. The bill extends through September 30, 2030, the requirement for the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to make determinations and submissions related to the connection between herbicide exposure and occurrence of disease. Additionally, the VA is prohibited from taking the costs of compensation into account when determining the association between exposure to an herbicide agent and occurrence of a disease. The bill requires the VA to determine within 120 days (currently 60) whether a presumption of service-connection is warranted for diseases covered by a National Academy of Sciences report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keeping Our Promises Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
2021-03-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2021-03-26HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback