US HB2265 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Investment Company Act of 1940 to postpone the date of payment or satisfaction upon redemption of certain securities in the case of the financial exploitation of specified adults, and for other purposes.
Title
Financial Exploitation Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2021-10-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5848-5849) |
2021-10-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2265. |
2021-10-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5848-5850) |
2021-10-25 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |