US HB2264 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-6)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the import, export, and commerce of bear viscera or related products except for limited acts carried out solely to enforce wildlife protection laws.
Title
Bear Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3196 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Foreign trade and international finance
Mammals
Trade restrictions
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Foreign trade and international finance
Mammals
Trade restrictions
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2264/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2264/BILLS-116hr2264ih.pdf |