US HB2264 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-6)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bear Protection Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bear Protection Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3196 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback