US HB2249 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Pending: House Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HAND UP Act Help Americans in Need Develop their Ultimate Potential Act
Title
HAND UP Act Help Americans in Need Develop their Ultimate Potential Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition. |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources. |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Financial Services, Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Financial Services, Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Financial Services, Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Financial Services, Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Financial Services, Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Financial Services, Education and the Workforce, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Department of Agriculture
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Employment and training programs
Food assistance and relief
Intergovernmental relations
Low- and moderate-income housing
Medicaid
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Department of Agriculture
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Employment and training programs
Food assistance and relief
Intergovernmental relations
Low- and moderate-income housing
Medicaid
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Social welfare
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2249/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2249/BILLS-115hr2249ih.pdf |