US HB2247 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 233.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PUGET SOS Act Promoting United Government Efforts To Save Our Sound Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUGET SOS Act Promoting United Government Efforts To Save Our Sound Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 233.
2019-11-14HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-290.
2019-09-19HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-09-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-19HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
2019-04-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback