US HB2245 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 16.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CECIL Act Conserving Ecosystems by Ceasing the Importation of Large Animal Trophies Act This bill addresses international wildlife conservation efforts and trophy hunting. Specifically, this bill restricts (1) the importation or exportation of species that have been proposed to be listed as threatened or endangered species, or (2) the importation of a sport-hunted trophy of a threatened species or endangered species. In addition, the bill abolishes the International Wildlife Conservation Council of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Finally, the Government Accountability Office must study the effectiveness of trophy hunting in supporting international wildlife conservation efforts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CECIL Act Conserving Ecosystems by Ceasing the Importation of Large Animal Trophies Act

Sponsors

Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 16.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-07-18HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Subcommitte on Trade.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback