US HB2235 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Northern Rio Grande National Heritage Area.
Title
Northern Rio Grande National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB990 (Same As) 2021-10-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
SB3425 (Related) 2021-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3435 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
SB3425 (Related) 2021-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3435 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 230.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2235/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2235/BILLS-117hr2235ih.pdf |