US HB2223 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates new federal crimes related to transporting a minor across state lines for an abortion. Specifically, the bill makes it a crime to knowingly transport a minor across a state line to obtain an abortion without satisfying the requirements of a parental involvement law in the minor's resident state. A parental involvement law requires parental consent or notification, or judicial authorization, for a minor to obtain an abortion. The bill prohibits an individual who has committed incest with a minor from knowingly transporting the minor across a state line to receive an abortion. Finally, the bill makes it a crime for a physician to knowingly perform or induce an abortion on an out-of-state minor without first notifying the minor's parent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Interstate Abortion Notification Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-03-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2021-03-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB627 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB16 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB109 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback