US HB221 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-30)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-326.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Special Envoy for Monitoring and Combating anti-Semitism as an ambassador-rank official, appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, who leads the Office to Monitor and Combat anti-Semitism within the Department of State. (Under current law, the special envoy is appointed by the Secretary of State.) The President may nominate the special envoy from among State Department officers and employees. The special envoy shall be the primary advisor in the government relating to monitoring and combating anti-Semitism in foreign countries. The individual shall be of recognized distinction in combating anti-Semitism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Envoy to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism Act

Sponsors

Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]

Roll Calls

2019-01-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 29 (Y: 411 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-326.
2021-01-13HouseSigned by President.
2021-01-01HousePresented to President.
2020-12-31HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-12-31HouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9172)
2020-12-31HouseMrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 221, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9172)
2020-12-17SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-12-16SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7556)
2020-12-16SenateS.Amdt.2709 Amendment SA 2709 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-12-16SenateS.Amdt.2709 Amendment SA 2709 proposed by Senator Moran for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S7556; text: CR S7556) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-12-16SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7556)
2020-12-16SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-01-14SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-01-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-11HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 29). (text: CR 1/10/2019 H434)
2019-01-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H504-505)
2019-01-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-01-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 221.
2019-01-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H434-437)
2019-01-10HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB238 (Same As) 2020-06-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback