US HB2204 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits an executive agency from entering into a contract for the procurement of goods or services with any person that has business operations with an authority of the Venezuelan government that is not recognized as the legitimate government of Venezuela by the U.S. government. (The United States recognizes Juan Guaido as interim President of the legitimate government of Venezuela.)
Title
Venezuelan Contracting Restriction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1151 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 189.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Business ethics
Government operations and politics
Latin America
Public contracts and procurement
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela
Government operations and politics
Latin America
Public contracts and procurement
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2204/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2204/BILLS-116hr2204ih.pdf |