US HB22 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires federal agencies to make budget justification materials available to the public on a website. The bill also requires the Office of Management and Budget to make certain details regarding the materials available to the public, including a list of the agencies that submit budget justification materials to Congress, the dates that the materials are submitted to Congress and posted online, and links to the materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional Budget Justification Transparency Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-05 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 412 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2021-01-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-01-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 2 (Roll no. 9). (text: CR H62)
2021-01-05HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H71-72)
2021-01-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-01-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 22.
2021-01-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H62-66)
2021-01-05HouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-01-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB272 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback