US HB2199 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 232.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Federal Land Asset Inventory Reform Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to develop and maintain a current, accurate multipurpose cadastre (inventory) of federal real property to assist with federal land management activities, including, but not limited to, resource development and conservation, agricultural use, active forest management, environmental protection, and use of real property. Interior may enter into cost-sharing agreements with states to include any nonfederal lands in this cadastre. The federal share of any such agreement shall be up to 50% of the total cost to a state for the development of a cadastre of the nonfederal lands. Interior must submit a report, covering all cadastres and inventories authorized, operated, or maintained by all executive agencies, on: (1) existing real property inventories or any components of any cadastre; (2) consolidation of inventories and components; (3) the use of existing inventories and components of any cadastre; (4) cost savings that will be achieved; (5) a plan for implementation of this bill, including a cost estimate and the feasibility of using revenue from any authorized transactional activity to offset such costs; and (6) recommendations for legislation. (Sec. 4) Interior must: (1) make the cadastre available on the Internet in a graphically geo-enabled and searchable format; (2) ensure that the inventory required by this bill includes the identification of all lands and parcels suitable for disposal by Resource Management Plans conducted pursuant to the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976; and (3) prevent the disclosure of any parcels of land, buildings or facilities thereon, or related information, if this would impair or jeopardize national security or homeland defense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Land Asset Inventory Reform Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 232.
2017-09-25HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-322.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-05-23HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2017-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-04-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-04-27HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback